02/13/2024 | Effective Date 2024-02-13 | |||
02/13/2024 | Act 357 | |||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate Transmitted House | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Senate Hopper |