05/01/2023 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |||
05/01/2023 | Act 131 | |||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Hopper |