01/30/2024 | Effective Date 2024-01-30 | |||
01/30/2024 | Act 355 | |||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Hopper |