01/30/2024 | Effective Date 2024-01-30 | |||
01/30/2024 | Act 354 | |||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Hopper |