Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Recommitted | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Senate Hopper |