LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Georgia GA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB340
Draft Versions
GA
Georgia Senate Bill SB340
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session
Georgia Senate Bill SB340
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
January 25, 2024
Bill
January 9, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 13, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 2, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
March 15, 2024
Compare