Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 16, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 13, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024