04/08/2024 | Act 373 | |||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate Hopper |