04/23/2024 | Act 477 | |||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | Senate Hopper |