05/06/2024 | Act 604 | |||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Senate Hopper |