Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB37 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 2, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2024
Bill March 22, 2023