House | 03/08/2023 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Senate Hopper |