Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Recommitted | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senate Hopper |