Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB465 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 14, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024