House | 03/28/2024 | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate Hopper |