04/19/2024 | Act 381 | |||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Senate Sent to Governor | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Passed/Adopted | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Third Readers | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House Committee Favorably Reported | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Senate Hopper |