Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB60 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 5, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023