House | 02/01/2024 | House Second Readers | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | House First Readers | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senate Hopper |