Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Passed/Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Third Read | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Taken from Table | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Tabled | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate Read Second Time | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Senate Read and Referred | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senate Hopper |