Georgia 2023-2024 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SR82 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill March 27, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 16, 2023