Georgia 2025-2026 Regular Session

Georgia Senate Bill SB10 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 5, 2025
Bill January 16, 2025

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 26, 2025
Bill February 12, 2025
Bill February 8, 2025