|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Received from Governor re: Emergency Appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from PDP/HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP/HHH on Friday, 02-05-21 11:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to PDP/HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|