Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 10:15AM in conference room CR 329.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Cullen Co-Chairs; Takumi, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Rhoads, Inouye Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 748) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Moriwaki, Taniguchi. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1635) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Kim; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-21 9:50AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to TRS, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 152).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 274), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2021
|
Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|