|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, McKelvey, Perruso Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Okimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Kim Chair; Kanuha, Acasio Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 750) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
One Day Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1689) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1199) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 3:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Re-Referred to HRE, WAM/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to HRE, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 153).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 791), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-17-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on GVR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to GVR.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to HET, GVR, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|