12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/10/2021 | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/26/2021 | Pending introduction. |