|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to HRE, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 161).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 823), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21 at 2:00PM in Room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-26-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 492) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to HET, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|