12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/18/2021 | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 419), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/26/2021 | Pending introduction. |