|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 486) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-21 at 10:30 AM in room 423.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|