|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Misalucha, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 762) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Chang, Ihara, Nishihara, Rhoads, Taniguchi. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Fevella, Gabbard, Lee). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1604) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1195) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Lee ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:30PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
The committee on EET has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-19-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 03-19-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 166).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 819), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) McDermott voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-03-21 9:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|