House
|
02/16/2022
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Okimoto, Perruso, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 452-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takumi; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 207) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-10-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|