|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|