|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 98).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 708), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 568) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Re-referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 7
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|