|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1194) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Kim, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 168).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 824), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-21.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) McKelvey, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|