|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to AEN/EET, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 99).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Morikawa, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 733), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Morikawa, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 554), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-17-21 at 10:00 am.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|