12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/19/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). | ||
House | 02/19/2021 | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 546) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. | ||
House | 02/16/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |