|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
The committee on EET deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
The committee(s) on EET/PSM/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-21 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Re-Referred to EET/PSM/HTH, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to PSM/HTH, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 169).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Okimoto, Perruso, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Takumi, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 838), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten; 3 Noes: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Perruso, Wildberger; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, McKelvey, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Nakamura, Perruso, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (5) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 620) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ward; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Tokioka; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Har, McKelvey, Okimoto, Perruso, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Wildberger voting no (5) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Reported from PDP/LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP/LAT on Tuesday, 02-09-21 8:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to PDP/LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|