|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 577), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 79), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|