|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
The committee(s) on LAT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 168) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAT.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to CMV, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|