|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 299).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 865) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 467) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-09-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|