12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/12/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). | ||
House | 02/12/2021 | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 199) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |