Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 797).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-23-21 9:50AM in conference room CR 229.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 10:00AM in conference room CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Quinlan, Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Eli, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2021
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791).
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kanuha, Kidani.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 781) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-21 9:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-31-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 173).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 839), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 387) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported from PDP/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP/ECD on Thursday, 02-04-21 11:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Referred to PDP/ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|