House
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 076, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2022
|
Act 076, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1176).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 9-22).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 9-22) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Rhoads, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Todd, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-22 1:45PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Rhoads, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
House Conferees Appointed: Kitagawa, Todd Co-Chairs; B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 743) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3900) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee on JDC/WAM has rescheduled its decision making to 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1165) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2021
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 10:00AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred to CPN, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 34).
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 703), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|