Hawaii 2022 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB1377 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2021

Amended

Bill April 23, 2021
Bill April 10, 2021
Bill March 25, 2021
Bill March 5, 2021