12/10/2021 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/09/2021 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 99) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 02/03/2021 | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/27/2021 | Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/21/2021 | Pending introduction. |