House | 02/10/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 157-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/28/2022 | Re-referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Prefiled. |