House
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 227, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Act 227, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 822).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
Deferred one day 05-03-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 812).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-05-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 387).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 612) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fevella, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3624) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-24-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3270) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to TRS, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 226).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 928-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 301-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, Clark, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|