House | 02/18/2022 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 618-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, McDermott. | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Prefiled. |