Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Referred to JDC, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 10).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 684-22), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 564-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-22 at 9:30AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-09-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|