Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Act 003, 04/07/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Act 003, on 04/07/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1103).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 548).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
One Day Notice 03-28-22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3379) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-22 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 229).
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 571-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-22 at 9:30AM.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-09-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|