|
12/10/2021
|
Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 187).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 874) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2021
|
Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Eli, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2021
|
The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21 at 10:30 am.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2021
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2021
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|